Financial history KIRKBURTON AND HIGHBURTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £30.49k £36.08k £30.81k £24.27k £32.38k
Total expenditure £26.55k £14.53k £35.40k £29.11k £34.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.25k £21.57k £2.95k £1.30k £0