TYWI GATEWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Trust are: To promote for the benefit of the public at the Bishop's Park and its cultural setting in Abergwili the conservation, protection, improvement and understanding of the built and natural environments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,163 from 62163 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 20 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Betsan Caldwell | Chair | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Huw Michael | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Neil Caldwell | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Pugh Bevan | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Loughran | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eric James Kitchen | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Alder | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Gwenllian Dorsett | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.84k | £227.91k | £98.80k | £293.18k | £225.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.17k | £139.90k | £205.02k | £248.62k | £321.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £600 | £3.42k | £2.10k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £69.33k | £189.09k | £87.28k | £129.29k | £62.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 20 May 2016 as amended on 11 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT THE BISHOP'S PARK AND ITS CULTURAL SETTING IN ABERGWILI THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Bishop's Palace
Abergwili
Carmarthen
Carmarthenshire
SA31 2JG
- Phone:
- 07399265237
- Website:
-
tywigateway.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window