YOSHOR TRUST

Charity number: 1168607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty and advancement of education activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £24,432
Total expenditure: £51,676

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Gateshead
  • Manchester City
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSEPH SCHLEIDER Chair 01 September 2016
JEWISH COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF GATESHEAD
Received: On time
ZAYIS RAANON
Received: On time
MOSHE SCHLEIDER Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
SHOLEM SCHLEIDER Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record
YEHUDA SCHLEIDER Trustee 19 April 2016
WELL OF TORAH
Received: On time
SAUL SCHLEIDER Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record
ELI SCHLEIDER Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £41.13k £31.75k £45.25k £35.02k £24.43k
Total expenditure £36.70k £29.54k £30.58k £31.27k £51.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 07 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 07 August 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 07 August 2024 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 10 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 ST. ALBANS TERRACE
GATESHEAD
NE8 4HA
Phone:
01617951212
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available