Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WASHINGTON
Charity Number: 1168608

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Charlotte Rutter | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ellen Petherick | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas George Hindmarch | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Teresa Margaret Walton | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Scarr | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Scorer | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Wesley Alan Hindmarch | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Gollan | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Rutter | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Petherick | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
ANN PATRICIA HARRISON | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
PHYLLIS MARY WOOD | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FIDDY | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE MCINTYRE | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERYL NESBITT | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS PETHERICK | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY EDWARD ANDREW POWELL | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE SANGHA | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WOOD | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.