Financial history NEWCASTLE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1167876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £118.97k £230.16k £138.34k £161.48k £161.21k
Total expenditure £141.82k £212.03k £129.74k £143.10k £180.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A