Financial history THE CORPUS OF ROMANESQUE SCULPTURE IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1168535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.00k £6.45k £10.90k £5.00k £7.02k
Total expenditure £13.94k £8.35k £11.79k £8.32k £8.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A