ST. FAITH'S CHURCH, GAYWOOD, KING'S LYNN SINGLE CONGREGATION LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Gaywood, St Faith's in accordance with the principles and practices of the Anglican and Methodist Churches. by a) the celebration of public worship; b) the teaching of the Christian faith; c) mission and evangelism; d) pastoral work; e) the provision of community facilities with a Christian ethos and f) the support of other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 04 August 2016: Standard registration
- ST. FAITH'S GAYWOOD LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Lesley Pearson | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Vernon Hooke | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Ann Flint | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robin David Banham | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tiffany Ridd | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Mbuthia | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Michaela Alexandra Sorensen | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Benstead | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Evelyn Nadar | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Chris Monica Sarah Ballard | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Robert Llewelyn Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
RACHEL VERONICA VYSE | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||||
JOYCE ENID BANHAM | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD DAVID ARNOLD PARR | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Andrew John Hiles | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
DAVID PHILIP GREENING | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH MARY JAMES | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
JOAN GREENING | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
JOYCE ELLA STEVENS | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
MATTHEW STEVENSON | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH STEVENSON | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN JANE McINTYRE CRANKO PAGE | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
GILLIAN AUDREY HILES | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.63k | £141.85k | £100.32k | £202.85k | £119.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.91k | £97.21k | £113.80k | £120.86k | £135.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £44.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 JERMYN ROAD
KING'S LYNN
PE30 4AE
- Phone:
- 01553761040
- Website:
-
stfaithsgaywoodlep.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window