Financial history ST PETER'S CHURCH DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1169510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £22.36k £8.00k £15.16k £29.01k £26.99k
Total expenditure £20.05k £13.98k £18.14k £42.77k £44.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A N/A N/A £5.60k