Financial history THE NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE CHILDREN'S LITERACY TRUST

Charity Number: 1176961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.36k £1.39k £41.61k £25.61k £19.85k
Total expenditure £1.62k £3.30k £6.40k £15.69k £31.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £36.00k £17.00k £4.75k