TADS (THERAPIES FOR ANXIETY, DEPRESSION AND STRESS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a mental health charity based in Barnsley, we have a team of staff and volunteers who support 5 to 25 year olds with mental health issues. The charity works within Schools, Colleges and through funders offers young people the following services... Wellbeing Play Therapy Counselling LGBTQ support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Total income includes £27,950 from 8 government contract(s) and £9,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Kirklees
Governance
- 13 June 2017: CIO registration
- Hey! The Mental Health Charity For Children and Young People (Working name)
- TADS (Previous name)
- TADS (THERAPIES FOR ANXIETY, DEPRESSION AND STRESS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Joe Hayward | Chair | 03 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Balvinder Virk | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Jack Brennan | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.01k | £184.26k | £169.35k | £59.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.43k | £126.85k | £130.75k | £143.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.43k | £40.04k | £43.47k | £9.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF NEED AND SUFFERING, IN EACH CASE AMONGST CHILDREN AND ADULTS, THROUGH THE RELIEF OF ANXIETY, DEPRESSION AND STRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hey! The Mental Health Charity
Beechurst House, 189 Sheffield Road
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S70 4DE
- Phone:
- 01226872120
- Email:
- admin@tadsbarnsley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window