Accounts and annual returns BEDEAU HERITAGE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1171797
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 24 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days