Trustees THE CITY OF OXFORD CHARITY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1172230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ERIC F Joint Trustee 25 October 2024
None on record
Michael Clements Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Barbara Joan Coyne Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
James Fry Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Edward Mundy Trustee 29 July 2022
None on record
Patricia Lindsey Kennedy Trustee 29 July 2022
None on record
Dr Ishanthi Bratby Trustee 29 July 2022
None on record
Christopher Smowton Trustee 29 July 2022
None on record
Susanna Pressel Trustee 10 July 2021
THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE OXFORDSHIRE BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Andrew James Fairweather-Tall Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Jenny Kay Williams Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
JUDITH GARRY MARY GAY Trustee 25 October 2019
None on record
GRAHAM RODERICK JONES Trustee 25 October 2019
None on record
JOHN VINCENT GOULD Trustee 25 October 2019
None on record
CATHERINE ELIZABETH HILLIARD Trustee 25 October 2019
FRIENDS OF THE OXFORD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Christine Mary Simm Trustee 25 October 2019
None on record
ALEXANDER JOHN HOLLINGSWORTH Trustee 25 October 2019
LOCAL INFORMATION UNIT LIMITED
Received: On time
Jane Lindsay Mactaggart Trustee 25 October 2019
None on record