Financial history WEYBRIDGE LADIES AMATEUR ROWING CLUB (WLARC)

Charity Number: 1171691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £30.16k £18.25k £26.56k £37.39k £38.29k
Total expenditure £36.12k £43.44k £21.81k £28.91k £30.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.40k £300 £1.91k N/A N/A