EDEN SIGHT SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eden Sight Support is developing its resources to provide support for vision impaired people in the Eden district. We want to ensure vision impaired people are not disadvantaged through disability, low income or lack of knowledge, but have access to: support, training in new skills, aids for everyday living, help provided by statutory authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £990 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 July 1979: Standard registration
- 22 August 2023: Funds received from 1171727 GOLDEN YEARS LUNCH AND SOCIAL CLUB
- EVSB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHIRLEY GRISEDALE | Chair | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Antony Renny | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Gray | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PEARSON NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.50k | £24.95k | £17.83k | £19.36k | £16.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.30k | £20.28k | £20.87k | £13.10k | £18.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.21k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £1.52k | N/A | £990 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/11/1978 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/1979 AS AMENDED ON 16/01/1995 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE VISUALLY IMPAIRED – BEING THOSE PEOPLE WITH AN IMPAIRMENT OF THE VISUAL FUNCTION FOR WHICH FULL REMEDIATION IS NOT POSSIBLE BY CONVENTIONAL SPECTACLES, CONTACT LENSES OR MEDICAL INTERVENTION AND WHICH CAUSES RESTRICTION IN THAT PERSONS EVERYDAY LIFE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. SUPPORTING PEOPLE WITH VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE PEOPLE WITH A VISUAL IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREA OF EDEN DISTRICT COUNCIL AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF THEIR LIVES. 2. PROVIDING INFORMATION AND DEMONSTRATING SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT TO VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE AND TO THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. 3. PROVIDING VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE WITH SOCIAL SUPPORT, TRAINING IN NEW SKILLS AND ACTIVITIES. 4. PROMOTING AWARENESS OF SIGHT ISSUES ON BEHALF OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE. 5. DOING ALL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE THINGS THAT SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF EDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Resource Centre
Sandgate
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA11 7TP
- Phone:
- 01768891724
- Website:
-
edensightsupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window