Financial history THE HASLEMERE PENNY HA'PENNY TRUST

Charity number: 1169411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.15k £6.80k £4.64k £14.32k £2.94k
Total expenditure £14.54k £17.20k £7.87k £10.54k £5.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A