GILLINGHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1169112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We undertake religious activities in accordance with the Christian Faith, holding services and mid-week activities for children, young people & adults also providing nurturing & support. We also run a Christian Debt Centre, coffee mornings and a Lunch Club. Various Community Groups use our premises including people with learning disabilities, cookery classes, Pre School and mental health needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £232,050
Total expenditure: £177,904

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2016: CIO registration
  • 11 October 2018: Funds received from 233942 GILLINGHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
  • 11 December 2024: Funds received from 233943 THE BRIDGE NORTH GILLINGHAM'S LOCAL BAPTIST CHURCH
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev STEPHEN GREASLEY Chair 09 September 2016
None on record
Ishaku Bature Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Cynthia Gloria Nicholls Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Nicola Jane Lownds Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Sharon Margaret Greasley Trustee 15 November 2022
THE CHRISTIAN CONFERENCE TRUST
Received: On time
Penelope Ann Wyatt Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
John David Lownds Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Dr Rachel Davey Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Romane Raphael Khelawan Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Dr Simon Collins Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Helen Clare Holloway Trustee 20 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £219.39k £205.44k £249.60k £213.39k £232.05k
Total expenditure £387.29k £151.85k £169.73k £169.90k £177.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.44k N/A
Income from government grants £200 N/A £200 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gillingham Baptist Church
Green Street
GILLINGHAM
Kent
ME7 5TJ
Phone:
01634850369