Financial history OPEN DOFE CENTRES IN WEST SUSSEX

Charity number: 1169592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £7.02k £10.09k £19.02k £15.89k £14.33k
Total expenditure £11.65k £11.28k £14.86k £13.19k £11.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £245 N/A N/A N/A N/A