HANWELL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
Governance
- 20 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ajay Singh | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Stephen John Day | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Flora Todlana | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Camilla Lewis | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ashley Sears | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Elisabetta Favaro | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sears | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Katherine Stanton | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Kingsnorth | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|||||
George Henry Lafford | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Fleur Laura Hatherall | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Gareth John Knox | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|||||
MARION GARNETT | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA GRANT | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY BLACKWELL | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PIDOUX | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RAWLINGS | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BLACKWELL | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH LAVELLE | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE RAWLINGS | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILL STANDFIELD | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RITA MACMURRAY | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.44k | £80.51k | £70.29k | £118.12k | £104.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.06k | £64.54k | £70.88k | £77.76k | £67.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
05 July 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEPT 1932
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARD AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT,LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR STI TUITION BEING A SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HANWELL METHODIST CHURCH
16 CHURCH ROAD
LONDON
W7 1DJ
- Phone:
- 02085791339
- Email:
- ajay.singh@methodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window