Financial history DRIFFIELD CHILDREN'S OUTING FUND

Charity number: 508574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £0 £709 £3.45k £700 £6.52k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £8.23k £757 £6.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A