Financial history OUTSIDE IN ART

Charity Number: 1171128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £439.53k £937.42k £462.50k £601.92k £425.12k
Total expenditure £457.03k £357.01k £476.40k £571.93k £584.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £103.12k £101.84k £99.56k £104.50k £101.84k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £920.65k N/A £527.17k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £11.67k N/A £61.49k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £500.00k N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £5.10k N/A £13.26k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £353.74k N/A £533.12k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £3.27k N/A £38.81k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.48k N/A £10.22k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A