WALLINGFORD EMERGENCY FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN WALLINGFORD AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, GOODS AND SERVICES OF ANY KIND AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Highmoor Brewster | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Victoria Mary-Maren Parry | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Charles Rhodes | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kya Isaacs | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wood | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Peter Clements | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
David Malcolm Tole | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALICE JEAN PENNEY | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.06k | £48.63k | £48.79k | £43.19k | £65.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.28k | £15.48k | £49.10k | £51.67k | £73.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.95k | £2.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
'TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN WALLINGFORD AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, GOODS AND SERVICES OF ANY KIND AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 St Mary's Street
Wallingford
OX10 0EW
- Phone:
- 01491876677
- Email:
- ridgewayfood@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window