ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable, welfare, educational, community cohesion and propasation of Islam & Islamic education & worship purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 12 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMJID WAZIR | Chair | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Majid Khan | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KHADIM HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD RAZZAQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD SHABIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALEEM MOHAMMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL SHAKOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMED IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
QUDRAT ULLAH | Trustee |
|
||||||
RANA MUHAMMAD TUFAIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.97k | £136.96k | £149.34k | £177.82k | £153.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.27k | £106.78k | £71.93k | £102.73k | £136.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 1979 AS AMENDED ON THE 26 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM IN THE CITY OF STOKE-ON-TRENT AND OTHER AREAS OF NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE, A BURIAL GROUND, AND OF EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES AND THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL THINK FIT AND FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG MEMBERS OF THE ISLAMIC CENTRE.
Area of benefit
STOKE-ON-TRENT MAINLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
178 CAULDON ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 2DY
- Phone:
- 01782746485
- Email:
- iqbal1612@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
citycentralmosque.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window