Trustees CAMDEN COMMUNITY CENTRES' CONSORTIUM
Charity Number: 1172914

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Alan Crozier | Chair | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Francis Pitt | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Bhuvan Sharma | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Nazrul Islam | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Benaifer Bhandari | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Tricia Richards | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
SUSAN MARY MEASURES | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
LINDSAY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Nasim Ali OBE | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
Foyezur Miah | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.