Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BEXHILL HOSPITAL CIO

Charity number: 1169175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £132.81k £74.89k £234.75k £187.27k £1.14m
Total expenditure £200.77k £41.22k £231.49k £256.96k £212.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £930.97k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £37.48k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £175.34k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.56k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £193.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.52k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0