THINKTANK THEATRE (STREATHAM SPACE PROJECT)

Charity Number: 1172475
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote, maintain, improve and advance education in and appreciation of the arts in all forms among the people of Streatham and the surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £276,363
Total expenditure: £336,291

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • STREATHAM SPACE PROJECT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN JAMES HARRIS Chair 07 April 2017
None on record
Edua Effiom Trustee 20 April 2024
None on record
Jennifer Claire Grainger Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
YASSINE SENGHOR Trustee 03 December 2018
Marlborough Theatre Productions Ltd
Received: 4 days late
Jayson Harris Trustee 04 January 2018
None on record
Karen Di Lorenzo Trustee 07 April 2017
THE ASSOCIATED BOARD OF THE ROYAL SCHOOLS OF MUSIC
Received: On time
David Money Trustee 20 March 2017
None on record
Katherine Anderson Trustee 20 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £230.14k £276.84k £224.15k £313.77k £276.36k
Total expenditure £233.76k £219.46k £237.91k £309.49k £336.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £145.29k £77.00k N/A £39.92k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 February 2025 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 February 2025 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Streatham Space Project
142-170 Streatham Hill
Unit 4 The Theatre
London
SW2 4RU
Phone:
02039417601