THE STOKE ON TRENT MUSLIM WELFARE AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable, welfare, community cohesion & educational purposes.Funerals, weddings, birthdays, advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 28 June 1979: Standard registration
- WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kabri Uddin Ahmed | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Riaz | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
QUDRAT ULLAH | Trustee |
|
||||||
RANA MUHAMMAD TUFAIL | Trustee |
|
||||||
ASGHAR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJID KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASLAM MOHAMMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GULTASB KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAFIQ SHEIKH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.76k | £35.38k | £18.12k | £20.78k | £29.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.61k | £19.61k | £11.30k | £8.40k | £14.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.40k | £1.86k | £2.09k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 1979 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1979 , 26 DECEMBER 1993 AND 5 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE, SHELTON, HANLEY, FENTON, LONGTON, BURSLEM, TUNSTALL, NEWCASTLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
178 CAULDON ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 2DY
- Phone:
- 07816993413
- Email:
- iqbal1612@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window