Financial history EAGLE'S NEST COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1170232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £24.41k £40.64k £38.11k £23.69k £22.59k
Total expenditure £19.08k £19.76k £31.03k £37.40k £30.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.00k £23.09k N/A N/A N/A