Financial history THE BERWICK-UPON-TWEED CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 508953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.69k £2.84k £7.50k £6.42k £5.84k
Total expenditure £2.39k £5.12k £8.58k £6.21k £6.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A