COTTON TEXTILES RESEARCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded for the benefit of workers in the British Textile Industry the charity's work includes the promotion of medical research into the prevention, treatment and cure of ailments and diseases to which such workers are especially liable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 28 August 1979: Standard registration
- BRITISH COTTON GROWING ASSOCIATION WORKPEOPLE'S COLLECTION FUND (Previous name)
- THE COTTON TEXTILES RESEARCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID ROBERT COLMAN OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Dr Claudia Henninger | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Susan Postlethwaite | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
William Sampson Professor | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew James Ogden | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PROF ROGER GREEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ALAN JOHN BOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.37k | £100.44k | £94.43k | £84.90k | £180.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.98k | £4.16k | £189.18k | £91.74k | £195.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 276 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COURT OF APPEAL ORDER DATED 23 JUNE 1959 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 10 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 MAY 2004 as amended on 14 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER TO BE BENEFICIAL TO WORKERS IN THE TEXTILE INDUSTRY INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF AILMENTS ESPECIALLY LIABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER
OXFORD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M13 9PL
- Phone:
- 01613066000
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window