Financial history TANG HALL BIG LOCAL

Charity Number: 1171161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £225.82k £139.19k £167.33k £151.33k £97.50k
Total expenditure £186.29k £168.71k £137.57k £124.89k £186.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A