Sts. Barbara, Phanourius and Paul the Apostle Greek Orthodox Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orthodox Church serving local Orthodox Community eg Greeks, Romanians, Serbian, Russian, Moldavian and other Orthodox worshippers. In addition the church welcomes all to attend services and events, for example Greek Social Evenings and weekly Coffee get togethers. There is also a Greek School on Saturdays, where all are welcome to attend and learn Greek language and culture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 21 March 2017: Standard registration
- St Barbara's Church (Working name)
- St Barbara's GOC (Working name)
- Sts BPP Greek Orthodox Church (Working name)
- SAINT BARBARA'S GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (SOUTHEND ON SEA DISTRICT) (Previous name)
- SAINT BARBARA'S GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE SOUTHEND ON SEA & DISTRICT (Previous name)
- ST.BARBARA'S, ST.PHANOURIOUS AND ST PAUL' CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PANAGIOTIS SKORDAS | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAY SMART | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA KAMBUROVA | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PHOTAKOS | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias | Trustee | 04 December 2019 | ||||||
Panayiotis Toumbas | Trustee | 08 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELIKI CHARALAMBOUS | Trustee | 01 February 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.11k | £36.02k | £45.36k | £63.83k | £73.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.06k | £33.21k | £42.92k | £61.59k | £70.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 FEB 2017 as amended on 04 Dec 2019 as amended on 04 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE GREEK ORTHODOX RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SOUTHEND ON SEA THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND RUNNING OF A CHURCH, VICARAGE AND A GREEK ORTHODOX SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sts. Barbara Phanourius & Paul The Apostle GOC
Salisbury Avenue
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
Essex
SS0 7AU
- Phone:
- 07825616058
- Email:
- cjohnanderson@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window