Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD REHOBOTH CHRISTIAN CENTRE CHORLEY

Charity number: 1171300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £23.58k £24.74k £85.09k £78.85k £121.05k
Total expenditure £20.77k £22.00k £44.66k £78.59k £114.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £300 N/A £3.00k £280