THE WILLIAM BARROW'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons resident in the Parochial Parish of Borden who are in need, hardship or distress, in particular those aged 60 years of more, and to advance the education of persons under the age of 25 who are in need of financial assistance by offering support to local schools; and awarding scholarships, bursaries and similar awards to those going into tertiary education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 09 May 2017: CIO registration
- 02 August 2021: Funds received from 307574 THE WILLIAM BARROW'S CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Hannah Stickings | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Middleton | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Fairbrass | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Mair | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Richard Herbert | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Dewar-Whalley | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Robert Dixon | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Arthur Wetherell | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES BATT | Trustee | 14 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND GARTH DOUBLEDAY | Trustee | 23 October 1980 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.00k | £302.82k | £270.95k | £276.23k | £347.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.96k | £207.80k | £170.24k | £147.57k | £205.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2022 as amended on 06 Jun 2024 as amended on 13 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: 1) The relief of persons, in particular but not exclusively, resident in the Parochial Parish of Borden who are in need, hardship or distress, in particular those aged 60 years of more, by: a. making grants of money to them; or b. providing or paying for goods, services or facilities for them; or c. making grants of money to other persons or bodies who provide goods, services or facilities to those in need. 2) To advance the education of persons under the age of 25, as at 31st August in the academic year preceding payment of grant, who are resident in the Parochial Parish of Borden; by: a. offering support to local schools that is not provided by statutory authorities; and b. awarding scholarships, bursaries and similar awards to those entering into or continuing in tertiary education.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Park Road
Sittingbourne
ME10 1DY
- Phone:
- 01795470556
- Email:
- stuart@georgewebbfinn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window