THE OLDHAM EAST AND WEST DIVISIONS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oldham
Governance
- 08 November 1979: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING EAST AND WEST DIVISIONS (Working name)
- THE OLDHAM EAST AND WEST DIVISIONS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Griffith | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Naomi Sanderson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Roscoe | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MILLICENT FEBER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICIA ELIZABETH CALDWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA MEYNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.56k | £6.55k | £107.28k | £550 | £454 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.63k | £1.04k | £10.50k | £89 | £540 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS IN ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
OLDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Paulden Avenue
OLDHAM
OL4 2JA
- Phone:
- 01616220694
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window