Financial history THE WOOSNAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1171136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £77.23k £66.29k £66.41k £75.93k £89.31k
Total expenditure £168.54k £262.94k £267.31k £115.05k £242.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A