Financial history PARKVIEW CHAPEL, BOTESDALE

Charity number: 1170915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £39.98k £44.62k £55.77k £55.32k £52.78k
Total expenditure £41.84k £41.03k £51.29k £50.72k £56.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A