Financial history MILFORD ON SEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1172750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.84k £9.94k £19.19k £9.29k £16.17k
Total expenditure £2.36k £6.28k £15.03k £10.95k £13.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £2.30k £800 £1.22k £2.30k