TIVERTON UNITED CHURCH (METHODIST AND URC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian Faith in the area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 05 September 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas Lakin | Chair | 25 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Clive Martin Williams | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Wendy Elizabeth Walker | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Allington | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Piers Buchanan | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Williams | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Arendina Wall | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE MAY BLACKWELL | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|||||
GORDON LEACH CLATWORTHY | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA MAY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN ALLINGTON | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE DUMMETT | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.46k | £47.16k | £90.39k | £90.15k | £126.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.09k | £42.97k | £109.20k | £98.65k | £96.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tiverton United Church
St. Peter Street
TIVERTON
Devon
EX16 6NU
- Phone:
- 07895 740286
- Email:
- circuitoffice@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window