Financial history THE MEDWAY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 1172065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.47m £694.53k £1.31m £1.49m £1.94m
Total expenditure £1.46m £782.85k £1.29m £1.40m £1.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.31k £24.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £46.79k £4.30k £6.49k £14.36k £5.79k
Income - Other trading activities £1.47k £0 £1.03k £0 £1.60k
Income - Charitable activities £1.42m £655.09k £1.29m £1.47m £1.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.06k £123 £188 £4.73k £7.02k
Income - Other £0 £35.02k £7.95k £1.82k £1.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £782.85k £1.29m £1.40m £1.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £103 £0 £768 £1.52k £1.61k
Expenditure - Governance £16.75k £53.23k £19.38k £19.04k £15.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £212.57k £96.20k £231.92k £120.42k £287.40k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0