Financial history SPACE (AYLESBURY)

Charity number: 1177979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.00k £56.72k £39.40k £60.96k £51.67k
Total expenditure £46.92k £51.62k £52.26k £50.37k £55.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.00k
Income from government grants £12.00k £24.49k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k