THE APPLEDORE BOOK FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Appledore Book Festival raises the profile of Appledore, increases enjoyment of reading in the community for all ages and abilities through exciting events, raises money for local charitable purposes and encourages support for libraries. The Festival advances the education of the public in the subject of literature, reading and the local history of Appledore and its surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 23 February 2017: Standard registration
- 26 June 2018: Funds received from 1126427 THE APPLEDORE BOOK FESTIVAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hamilton Cable | Chair | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rogers Britton | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Kearney | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Mendosa | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Douglas Taylor | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|||||
David Dykes Stevenson | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Janet Dianne Thompson | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Sandon | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hadley-Smith | Trustee | 19 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.50k | £59.33k | £174.23k | £183.88k | £205.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.92k | £84.04k | £116.76k | £175.24k | £192.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | £4.65k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF LITERATURE, READING AND THE LOCAL HISTORY OF APPLEDORE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA. TO ADVANCE ANY PURPOSE THAT IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Windmill Lane
Northam
BIDEFORD
Devon
EX39 1BZ
- Phone:
- 01237 238798
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window