Financial history FRIENDS OF KILLHOPE

Charity Number: 1173789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.51k £1.38k £1.52k £1.34k £2.59k
Total expenditure £1.40k £1.11k £1.33k £1.60k £862
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A