CHARITY OF CHARLES COOPER FOR ALMSHOUSES INCLUDING AUGMENTATIONS OF JOHN EVERITT COOPER

Charity Number: 509766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide almshouses-accomodation for needy people who are living in or native of Gainsborough or Misterton.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,629
Total expenditure: £17,053

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARLES COOPER TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL DAVID JOHN HOWITT-COWAN Chair 09 February 2018
GAINSBOROUGH AND DISTRICT WELFARE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF GAINSBOROUGH OLD HALL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CORRINGHAM VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
WILLINGHAM AND DISTRICT RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF MUSEUMS
Received: On time
MARSHALL'S AND ROSE BROTHERS MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
Lynda Marie Mullally Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
TONY WING Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
Sheila Bibb CO-OPTED Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
Miranda Snee Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
JESSIE MILNE Trustee 08 May 2017
FRANCIS BARKER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WALTER GERMAN ROSE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
GAINSBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
IAN GEORGE KEAT Trustee 03 August 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.18k £14.40k £14.70k £14.50k £16.63k
Total expenditure £9.08k £6.17k £7.46k £11.78k £17.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31 ENDERBY CRESCENT
GAINSBOROUGH
DN21 1XQ
Phone:
01427613889
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available