THE SIR SIMON MILTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The overriding aim of the charity is to continue delivering Sir Simon's vision of a caring City of Westminster that offers opportunity for all. The charity is focused on two key strands of work, primarily in Westminster, supporting: younger people, particularly in education and training; and older people in need, especially those who are lonely or socially isolated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 August 2017: CIO registration
- 13 May 2018: Funds received from 1149166 THE SIR SIMON MILTON FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Shaw OBE | Chair | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Horner | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Sally Angel | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Cohen | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hantman | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Caroline Walker | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JONATHAN DAVIS MBE DL | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
LISA MILTON | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.86k | £70.04k | £168.21k | £99.17k | £119.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £439.69k | £257.53k | £306.18k | £310.74k | £216.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLO ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE, INCLUDING OLDER PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, LONELINESS, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH. 3.2 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE BOROUGHS OF GREATER LONDON, IN PARTICULAR IN THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, INCLUDING PREPARING THEM FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CID FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sir Simon Milton Foundation
6 Trull Farm Buildings
Trull
TETBURY
Gloucestershire
GL8 8SQ
- Phone:
- 07971 092 773
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window