CHESHAM MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Chesham Museum is to educate visitors in the rich history of the town and the surrounding areas, for the benefit of both local residents and visitors. Our objectives are to display and promote aspects of local history, and as part of this to involve visitors in local history projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 April 2017: CIO registration
- 21 December 2018: Funds received from 1107115 CHESHAM MUSEUM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Squire | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Southwood | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David William Jordan | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Robert Cargill | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Yvonne Perkins | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE SHARP | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Katharine Dallas | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWE HATTON | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER SPRUYTENBURG | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £2.91k | £15.43k | £5.05k | £8.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.58k | £2.47k | £2.57k | £3.08k | £13.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.74k | £2.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Apr 2017 as amended on 18 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY DISPLAYING AND PROMOTING ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF CHESHAM AND THE PEOPLE OF THE TOWN; AND INVOLVING THE PEOPLE OF THE TOWN IN HISTORY PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
144 Chartridge Lane
CHESHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP5 2RH
- Phone:
- 01494 773653
- Email:
- info@cheshammuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window