Financial history HEALTHWATCH OXFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1172554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £282.95k £303.16k £304.73k £340.60k £392.65k
Total expenditure £295.32k £301.38k £329.85k £331.73k £338.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £294.33k
Income from government grants £243.05k £247.91k £252.87k £290.83k N/A