Financial history BRIXTON HILL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1173770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £105.74k £117.60k £116.64k £112.61k £123.17k
Total expenditure £128.20k £88.26k £132.28k £95.96k £91.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.00k