ST. MONICA'S HOUSING LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of free accommodation and limited financial support, for a limited period, for destitute adult females seeking asylum in the UK or who are actively pursuing an Appeal to the Immigration Tribunal or Courts, irrespective of race,colour,ethnicity, relegious beliefs or sexual orientation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 31 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir JOHN DOMINIC BATTLE | Chair | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony O'Brien | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Stuart | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadin Elizabeth Keymist | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dolf Andries Mogendorff | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHEELAGH PICKLES | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.62k | £16.65k | £19.72k | £28.06k | £112.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.22k | £22.93k | £31.11k | £52.89k | £103.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £800 | N/A | N/A | £6.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2011 as amended on 02 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM WHO ARE DESTITUTE AND LIVING TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY IN THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBER REGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY 2) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM WHO ARE DESTITUTE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE 3) TO PROMOTE ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
53
Kingswood Gardens
Leeds
West Yorkshire
LS8 2BH
- Phone:
- 07540634267
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window