Financial history C T HODGKINSON CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 509964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £284 £1.02k £1.02k £765
Total expenditure £200 £200 £200 £200 £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A