INTERNATIONAL BIBLE TRAINING COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) ADVANCING RELIGION BY I.PROVIDING SCHOOLS, COLLEGES & TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM ACROSS THE WORLD, EQUIPPING THEM WITH KNOWLEDGE OF THE HOLY BIBLE AND THE CHRISTIAN FAITH SO THEY BECOME MINISTERS, MISSIONARIES & EVANGELISTS; II THROUGH MISSION OUTREACHES, CAMPAIGNS, RADIO & TELEVISION BROADCASTS III PUBLISHING/DISTRIBUTING RELIGIOUS MATERIAL B) RELIEVING POVERTY IN UK & WORLDWIDE BY AID
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- IBTI (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL BIBLE TRAINING INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANDREW SHERRATT | Chair | 08 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Simon Pastorello | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||
JOHN WHYTE | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|||||
MARTYN RICHARD SHEPPARD | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|||||
BERNARD CLAIRVAUX LEWIS | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.62k | £976.48k | £454.64k | £123.44k | £158.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.29k | £197.15k | £294.56k | £258.88k | £211.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £853.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £122.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £533 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £17.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £197.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND CARRYING ON SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES TO TRAIN PEOPLE FROM ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD TO BECOME MINISTERS, MISSIONARIES AND EVANGELISTS IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOOK PLACE
CUCKFIELD ROAD
BURGESS HILL
WEST SUSSEX
RH15 8RF
- Phone:
- 01444233173
- Email:
- office@ibti.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window